+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1246
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1859
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor