+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.83
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.657
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
January 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor