+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.519
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
+ − Vote
March 2, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Women's Issues)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1