+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1550
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Education
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To New York City Education Subcommittee
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate New York City Education Subcommittee)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor