+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.245
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1343
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 19, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health)
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 26, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor