+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A3471
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.663
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
May 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor