+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a1601a
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading cal.1208
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 10, 2013
- Yeas: 25
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor