+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.321
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.407
- Substituted For A7656a
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5023a
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.679
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor