+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.87
- Signed Chap.670
On November 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.94
- Substituted For A5364
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.812
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Disabilities
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
April 27, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Disabilities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor