+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 499b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 499a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 21, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor