+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
On June 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.386
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
+ − Vote
February 14, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor