+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1214
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Vote
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor