+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.914
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor