+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a7099
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.757
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Vote
May 22, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - May 22, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor