+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4946d
- Amend and recommit to labor
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4946c
- Amend and recommit to labor
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to labor
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4946b
- Amend and recommit to finance
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4946a
- Amend and recommit to labor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to labor
+ − Vote
June 3, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Labor - Jun 3, 2013
- Yeas: 16
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea