+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a5556
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.702
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - May 21, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
May 21, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - May 21, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor