+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a6869
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.940
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Civil Service and Pensions - Jun 3, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
June 3, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Civil Service and Pensions - Jun 3, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor