+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.74
- Signed Chap.752
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.140
- Substituted For A1477
On March 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.294
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor