+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.939
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.678
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4890a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 18, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor