+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 4873a
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.669
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
+ − Vote
May 21, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - May 21, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor