+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7856
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1194
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor