+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.238
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.535
- Substituted For A5805a
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1621
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4857a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63