+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.404
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.423
- Substituted For A7824
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.508
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor