+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 485b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 485a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor