+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1107
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor