+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.487
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.561
- Substituted For A7345
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1371
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor