+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7553
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.480
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor