+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.787
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.370
- Substituted For A7315
On March 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.384
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Women's Issues)
- Yeas: 7