+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4820b
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4820a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1