+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.232
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 482b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 482a
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.512
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
March 30, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 8, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13