+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a7158
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.903
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
+ − Vote
May 20, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Codes - May 20, 2014
- Yeas: 16
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor