+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.174
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.382
- Substituted For A6916b
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4812b
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.652
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4812a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor