+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A5287
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.413
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
March 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor