+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 4802a
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.327
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1248
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7