+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1208
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor