+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1060
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor