+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.418
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.452
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4742a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 19
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor