+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.46
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.512
- Substituted For A123b
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1536
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4739a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor