+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.236
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.625
- Substituted For A6998
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1429
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 17, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor