+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.516
On September 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.761
- Substituted For A5128a
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1483
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4707a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor