+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.486
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.539
- Substituted For A5912a
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1238
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4688a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor