+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1725
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4645a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1466
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor