+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.389
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor