+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4631a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1817
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 6, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor