+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.131
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.651
- Substituted For A7463a
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4628a
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.379
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11