+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4622c
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4622b
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4622a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor