+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 4614a
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.478
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor