+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommit, enacting clause stricken
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4611b
- Amend and recommit to higher education
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4611a
- Amend and recommit to higher education
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education