+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4608b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4608a
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.549
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor