+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1881
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor